District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0856 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1- ENROLLED ORIGINAL
2-
3-
4-
5-
6-A RESOLUTION
7-
8-25-652
9-
10-IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
11-
12-October 1, 2024
13-
14-
15-To confirm the appointment of Dr. Kevin Cornell Bradshaw to the Board of Podiatry.
16-
17- RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this
18-resolution may be cited as the “Board of Podiatry Kevin Cornell Bradshaw Confirmation
19-Resolution of 2024”.
20-
21- Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment of:
22-
1+MURIEL BOWSER
2+MAYOR
3+Ju
4+ne 11, 2024
5+The Honorable Phil Mendelson
6+Chairman
7+Council of the D istrict of Columbia
8+John A. Wilson
9+Building
10+1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504
11+Washington, DC 20004
12+Dear Ch
13+airman M endelson:
14+In accordance
15+with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
16+142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant
17+to section 210 of the District of Columbia Health
18+Occupations
19+Revision Act of 1985, effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official Code § 3-
20+1202.10) I am pleased to nominate the following individual:
2321 Dr. Kevin Cornell Bradshaw
2422 Peabody S treet, NE
2523 Washington, DC 20011
2624 (Ward 4 )
2725
28-as a podiatrist licensed in the District member of the Board of Podiatry, established by section
29-210 of the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act of 1985, effective March 25,
30-1986 (D.C. Law 6- 99; D.C. Official Code § 3- 1202.10) , for a term to end April 16, 2026.
26+f
27+or appointment as a podiatrist licensed in the District member of the Board of Podiatry, filling a vacant
28+seat formerly held by Michangelo Scruggs, f
29+or the remainder of an unexpired term to end April 16,
30+2026.
31+Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-m entioned
32+nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process.
33+I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please
34+do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and
35+Appointments, should the Council require additional information.
36+Sincerely,
37+Muriel B owser
38+Mayor 1
39+2
40+3
41+4
42+5
43+6
44+7
45+8
46+9
47+10
48+11
49+12
50+13
51+14
52+15
53+16
54+17
55+18
56+19
57+20
58+21
59+22
60+23
61+24
62+25
63+26
64+27
65+28
66+29
67+30
68+31
69+32
70+33
71+~
72+Chairman Phil Mendelson
73+at the request
74+of the Mayor
75+A PROPOSED RESOLUTION
76+IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
77+To confirm the appointment
78+of Kevin Cornell Bradshaw to the Board of Podiatry.
79+RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this
80+resolution may be cited as the "Board
81+of Podiatry Kevin Cornell Bradshaw Confirmation
82+Resolution
83+of 2024".
84+Sec.
85+2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the appointment of:
86+Dr. Kevin Cornell Bradshaw
87+Peabody Street, NE
88+Washington, DC 20011
89+(Ward 4)
90+as a podiatrist licensed in the District member
91+of the Board of Podiatry, established by section
92+210
93+of the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act of 1985, effective March 25,
94+1986 (D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official
95+Code§ 3-1202.10), filling a vacant seat formerly held by
96+Michangelo Scruggs, for the remainder
97+of an unexpired term to end April 16, 2026.
98+Sec.
99+3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution,
100+upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office
101+of the Mayor.
102+Sec.
103+4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
104+PROFILE
105+lamaNativeWashingtonianwitha
106+missiontohelppeople.Wisthasolo
107+practiceinPodiatry,|havebeenin
108+practiceforovertwentyyears,with
109+aconcentrationonhomeHealth
110+care.|amaHouseCallDoctor,and|
111+loveit!Ihavehadanincredible
112+opportunitytohelppeoplefrom
113+everysectionoftheDistrictof
114+Columbia,andfromeverysocial-
115+economicstratum.Thishasgiven
116+meauniqueandinteresting
117+practice.
118+CONTACT
31119
32- Sec. 3. The Council shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the
33-nominee and to the Mayor.
120+HOBBIES
121+ModelBuilding
122+StudyingHistory
123+Gaming
124+Gardening
125+KCORNELL
126+BRADSHAW
127+Podiatrist
128+EDUCATION
129+OhioCollegeofPodiatricMedicineNKAKentStateSchoolof
130+Podiatry
131+1987-1991
132+FiskUniversity
133+1982-1986
134+WORKEXPERIENCE
135+SoloPrac
136+2012-Present
137+PracticecenteredinHomeHealthCare.Mypracticeservespatients
138+thatareunabletotraveltoseekpodiatriccare,Mostofthepatients
139+thatIsawhadadditionalmorbiditiessuchasDiabetes,
140+Cardiovascularpathologies,andothervariouspathologythatmade
141+traveldifficultforthepatient.
142+ joner,Podiatrist
34143
35- Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.
144+GroupPractitioner,AssociatePodiatrist
145+2009-2011
146+BroadcarepracticeinallaspectsofPodiatricMedicine.Wesawa
147+trulydiversegroupofpatientsthatvisitedforawiderangeofcare
148+frompalliativecare,woundcare,andsurgicalcare.
149+
150+2002-2008
151+GeneralPracticeinPodiatry,concentratingonpalliativecare,
152+biomechanicalassessments,sportsinjuries,anddermatologic
153+pathology.
154+Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments
155+John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004
156+
157+
158+
159+
160+Dr. Kevin Cornell Bradshaw
161+
162+Dr. Kevin Cornell Bradshaw is a Native Washingtonian with a mission
163+to help people. Dr. Bradshaw has a solo practice in podiatry and has
164+been in practice for over twenty years, with a concentration on home
165+health care.
166+As a house call doctor, Dr. Bradshaw enjoys the opportunity to help
167+people from every section of the District of Columbia, and from every
168+social-economic stratum. His practice serves patients that are unable to
169+travel to seek podiatric care. Most of the patients that he sees have
170+additional morbidities such as diabetes, cardiovascular pathologies, and
171+other various pathologies that make travel difficult for patients.
172+A Ward 4 resident, Dr . Bradshaw earned his Bachelor of Science in Chemistry from Fisk
173+University and his Doctor of Podiatry from the Ohio College of Podiatric Medicine.
174+
175+ GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
176+Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser
177+
178+Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor
179+
180+
181+______________________________________________________________________________
182+The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681
183+
184+To: Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker
185+From: Betsy Cavendish
186+Date: May 31, 2024
187+Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolution nominating Dr. Kevin Cornell Bradshaw
188+as a member of the Board of Podiatry
189+This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolution and
190+found it to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not
191+hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-
192+724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681.
193+
194+
195+______________________________
196+Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish
197+
198+