LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
District Of Columbia DC
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Council
Bills
PR25-0881
Action History
DC
District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0881
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session
District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0881
Action History
Council
07/19/2024
Resolution R25-0589, Effective from Jul 09, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 008614
Council
07/09/2024
Approved with Resolution Number R25-0589
Council
07/09/2024
Final Reading
Council
06/25/2024
Postponed to JULY 9, 2024 (R.White)
Council
06/25/2024
Retained by the Council
Council
06/24/2024
Introduced in Office of the Secretary