1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | 25-534 |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | June 25, 2024 |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
16 | | - | to amend An Act To create a Department of Corrections in the District of Columbia and |
---|
17 | | - | the Corrections Oversight Improvement Omnibus Amendment Act of 2022 to designate the |
---|
18 | | - | Department of Corrections as the District agency to provide a free appropriate public |
---|
19 | | - | education under the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act and District law to |
---|
20 | | - | certain individuals in its custody and detained in its secure facilities. |
---|
21 | | - | |
---|
22 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
23 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Special Education for Young Adults in the Custody of the |
---|
24 | | - | Department of Corrections Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. |
---|
25 | | - | |
---|
26 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On April 2, 2024, the Council passed the Special Education for Young Adults |
---|
27 | | - | in the Custody of the Department of Corrections Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, effective |
---|
28 | | - | April 15, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-446; 71 DCR 4635) (“emergency act”), which expires July 14, |
---|
29 | | - | 2024. |
---|
30 | | - | (b) On May 7, 2024, the Council also passed the Special Education for Young Adults in |
---|
31 | | - | the Custody of the Department of Corrections Temporary Amendment Act of 2024, enacted |
---|
32 | | - | April 15, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-485; 71 DCR 6760) (“temporary act”). The temporary act is |
---|
33 | | - | currently undergoing congressional review and has a projected law date of December 6, 2024. |
---|
34 | | - | (c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the |
---|
35 | | - | expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. |
---|
36 | | - | |
---|
37 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
38 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Special Education for Young Adults in |
---|
39 | | - | the Custody of the Department of Corrections Congressional Review Emergency Amendment |
---|
40 | | - | Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
41 | | - | |
---|
42 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 1 | + | 1 |
---|
| 2 | + | 1 |
---|
| 3 | + | _______________________ 2 |
---|
| 4 | + | Councilmember Brooke Pinto 3 |
---|
| 5 | + | 4 |
---|
| 6 | + | 5 |
---|
| 7 | + | 6 |
---|
| 8 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7 |
---|
| 9 | + | 8 |
---|
| 10 | + | ________ 9 |
---|
| 11 | + | 10 |
---|
| 12 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 11 |
---|
| 13 | + | 12 |
---|
| 14 | + | ________________ 13 |
---|
| 15 | + | 14 |
---|
| 16 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to 15 |
---|
| 17 | + | the need to amend An Act To create a Department of Corrections in the District of 16 |
---|
| 18 | + | Columbia and the Corrections Oversight Improvement Omnibus Amendment Act of 17 |
---|
| 19 | + | 2022 to designate the Department of Corrections as the District agency to provide 18 |
---|
| 20 | + | a free appropriate public education under the Individuals with Disabilities 19 |
---|
| 21 | + | Education Act and District law to certain individuals in its custody and detained 20 |
---|
| 22 | + | in its secure facilities. 21 |
---|
| 23 | + | 22 |
---|
| 24 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 23 |
---|
| 25 | + | this resolution may be cited as the “Special Education for Young Adults in the Custody 24 |
---|
| 26 | + | of the Department of Corrections Congressional Review Emergency Declaration 25 |
---|
| 27 | + | Resolution of 2024”. 26 |
---|
| 28 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On April 2, 2024, the Council passed the Special Education for Young 27 |
---|
| 29 | + | Adults in the Custody of the Department of Corrections Emergency Amendment Act of 28 |
---|
| 30 | + | 2024, effective April 15, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-446; 71 DCR 4635) (“emergency act”), 29 |
---|
| 31 | + | which expires July 14, 2024. 30 |
---|
| 32 | + | (b) On May 7, 2024, the Council also passed the Special Education for Young 31 |
---|
| 33 | + | Adults in the Custody of the Department of Corrections Temporary Amendment Act of 32 |
---|
| 34 | + | 2024, enacted April 15, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-485; 71 DCR 6760) (“temporary act”). The 33 2 |
---|
| 35 | + | temporary act is currently undergoing congressional review and has a projected law date 34 |
---|
| 36 | + | of December 6, 2024. 35 |
---|
| 37 | + | (c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between 36 |
---|
| 38 | + | the expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 37 |
---|
| 39 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 38 |
---|
| 40 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 39 |
---|
| 41 | + | Special Education for Young Adults in the Custody of the Department of Corrections 40 |
---|
| 42 | + | Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single 41 |
---|
| 43 | + | reading. 42 |
---|
| 44 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 43 |
---|