District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0883 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 06/25/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-534  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
June 25, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend An Act To create a Department of Corrections in the District of Columbia and 
the Corrections Oversight Improvement Omnibus Amendment Act of 2022 to designate the 
Department of Corrections as the District agency to provide a free appropriate public 
education under the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act and District law to 
certain individuals in its custody and detained in its secure facilities. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 
resolution may be cited as the “Special Education for Young Adults in the Custody of the 
Department of Corrections Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
 
 Sec. 2.  (a)  On April 2, 2024, the Council passed the Special Education for Young Adults 
in the Custody of the Department of Corrections Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, effective 
April 15, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-446; 71 DCR 4635) (“emergency act”), which expires July 14, 
2024.  
 (b) On May 7, 2024, the Council also passed the Special Education for Young Adults in 
the Custody of the Department of Corrections Temporary Amendment Act of 2024, enacted 
April 15, 2024 (D.C. Act 25-485; 71 DCR 6760) (“temporary act”). The temporary act is 
currently undergoing congressional review and has a projected law date of December 6, 2024. 
(c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the 
expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 
 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Special Education for Young Adults in 
the Custody of the Department of Corrections Congressional Review Emergency Amendment 
Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
 Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.