Council | 09/17/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0619 | ||
Council | 09/17/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 07/11/2024 | Roundtable Hearing Held | ||
Council | 07/09/2024 | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole | ||
Council | 07/05/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/05/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0888 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/02/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 07/01/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |