District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0949 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/16/2024

                    1 
     1 
   Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 
 7 
__________ 8 
 9 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 
 11 
__________ 12 
 13 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 14 
to continue foreclosure protections for homeowners who applied for funding from the DC 15 
Homeowner Assistance Fund (“DC HAF") program before September 30, 2022 and 16 
whose applications remain under review, pending approval, pending payment, or under 17 
appeal, and to require that notices continue to be sent to homeowners informing them of 18 
the DC HAF program before a foreclosure action. 19 
 20 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this   21 
resolution may be cited as the “Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund 22 
Coordination Congressional Review Emergency 	Declaration Resolution of 2024”	.   23 
Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the Council passed the Foreclosure Moratorium and 24 
Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25	-25 
514; 71 DCR 9340)	, which was enacted on July 18, 2024, and expires on October 16, 2024. 26 
(b) On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Foreclosure Moratorium and 27 
Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Temporary Amendment Act of 2024 (	D.C. Act 25-28 
533; 71 DCR 9942)	, which was transmitted to Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to 29 
become law on December 7, 2024. 30 
(c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the 31 
expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  32  2 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 33 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner 34 
Assistance Fund Coordination Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be 35 
adopted after a single reading.  36 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  37