District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0949 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/17/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-609  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
September 17, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to continue foreclosure protections for homeowners who applied for funding from the DC 
Homeowner Assistance Fund (“DC HAF") program before September 30, 2022 and 
whose applications remain under review, pending approval, pending payment, or under 
appeal, and to require that notices continue to be sent to homeowners informing them of 
the DC HAF program before a foreclosure action. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this   
resolution may be cited as the “Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund 
Coordination Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”.   
 
Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the Council passed the Foreclosure Moratorium and 
Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-
514; 71 DCR 9340), which was enacted on July 18, 2024, and expires on October 16, 2024. 
(b) On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Foreclosure Moratorium and 
Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Temporary Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-
533; 71 DCR 9942), which was transmitted to Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to 
become law on December 7, 2024. 
(c) Emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration 
of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner 
Assistance Fund Coordination Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be 
adopted after a single reading.  
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.