1 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
4 | | - | |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | |
---|
7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | 25-609 |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | September 17, 2024 |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
17 | | - | to continue foreclosure protections for homeowners who applied for funding from the DC |
---|
18 | | - | Homeowner Assistance Fund (“DC HAF") program before September 30, 2022 and |
---|
19 | | - | whose applications remain under review, pending approval, pending payment, or under |
---|
20 | | - | appeal, and to require that notices continue to be sent to homeowners informing them of |
---|
21 | | - | the DC HAF program before a foreclosure action. |
---|
22 | | - | |
---|
23 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this |
---|
24 | | - | resolution may be cited as the “Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund |
---|
25 | | - | Coordination Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. |
---|
26 | | - | |
---|
27 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the Council passed the Foreclosure Moratorium and |
---|
28 | | - | Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25- |
---|
29 | | - | 514; 71 DCR 9340), which was enacted on July 18, 2024, and expires on October 16, 2024. |
---|
30 | | - | (b) On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Foreclosure Moratorium and |
---|
31 | | - | Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Temporary Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25- |
---|
32 | | - | 533; 71 DCR 9942), which was transmitted to Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to |
---|
33 | | - | become law on December 7, 2024. |
---|
34 | | - | (c) Emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration |
---|
35 | | - | of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. |
---|
36 | | - | |
---|
37 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
38 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner |
---|
39 | | - | Assistance Fund Coordination Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be |
---|
40 | | - | adopted after a single reading. |
---|
41 | | - | |
---|
42 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 1 | + | 1 |
---|
| 2 | + | 1 |
---|
| 3 | + | Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 |
---|
| 4 | + | 3 |
---|
| 5 | + | 4 |
---|
| 6 | + | 5 |
---|
| 7 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 6 |
---|
| 8 | + | 7 |
---|
| 9 | + | __________ 8 |
---|
| 10 | + | 9 |
---|
| 11 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 |
---|
| 12 | + | 11 |
---|
| 13 | + | __________ 12 |
---|
| 14 | + | 13 |
---|
| 15 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 14 |
---|
| 16 | + | to continue foreclosure protections for homeowners who applied for funding from the DC 15 |
---|
| 17 | + | Homeowner Assistance Fund (“DC HAF") program before September 30, 2022 and 16 |
---|
| 18 | + | whose applications remain under review, pending approval, pending payment, or under 17 |
---|
| 19 | + | appeal, and to require that notices continue to be sent to homeowners informing them of 18 |
---|
| 20 | + | the DC HAF program before a foreclosure action. 19 |
---|
| 21 | + | 20 |
---|
| 22 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this 21 |
---|
| 23 | + | resolution may be cited as the “Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner Assistance Fund 22 |
---|
| 24 | + | Coordination Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024” . 23 |
---|
| 25 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the Council passed the Foreclosure Moratorium and 24 |
---|
| 26 | + | Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25 -25 |
---|
| 27 | + | 514; 71 DCR 9340) , which was enacted on July 18, 2024, and expires on October 16, 2024. 26 |
---|
| 28 | + | (b) On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Foreclosure Moratorium and 27 |
---|
| 29 | + | Homeowner Assistance Fund Coordination Temporary Amendment Act of 2024 ( D.C. Act 25-28 |
---|
| 30 | + | 533; 71 DCR 9942) , which was transmitted to Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to 29 |
---|
| 31 | + | become law on December 7, 2024. 30 |
---|
| 32 | + | (c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the 31 |
---|
| 33 | + | expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 32 2 |
---|
| 34 | + | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 33 |
---|
| 35 | + | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Foreclosure Moratorium and Homeowner 34 |
---|
| 36 | + | Assistance Fund Coordination Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be 35 |
---|
| 37 | + | adopted after a single reading. 36 |
---|
| 38 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 37 |
---|