District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0950 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/16/2024

                    1 
 
 
            ______________________________                                                                                1 
               Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 
 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
 8 
 9 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 10 
  11 
________ 12 
 13 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 14 
 15 
______________ 16 
 17 
 18 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 19 
to amend the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on voluntary 20 
agreements.  21 
 22 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 23 
may be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency 24 
Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 25 
Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the Council passed the Voluntary Agreement 26 
Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-	0517; 71 DCR 9351), 27 
which was enacted on July 18, 2024, and expires on October 20, 2024. 28 
(b)  On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Voluntary Agreement 29 
Moratorium Temporary Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-	0531; 71 DCR 9936), 30 
which was transmitted to Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to become law on 31 
December 7, 2024.  32 
(c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the 33  2 
 
 
expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  34 
Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 35 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 36 
Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review 	Emergency Declaration Resolution of 37 
2024 be adopted after a single reading. 38 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 39