District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0950 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/17/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-611  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
September 17, 2024 
 
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to amend the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on voluntary 
agreements.  
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 
may be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency 
Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the Council passed the Voluntary Agreement 
Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-0517; 71 DCR 9351), 
which was enacted on July 18, 2024, and expires on October 20, 2024. 
(b)  On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Voluntary Agreement 
Moratorium Temporary Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-0531; 71 DCR 9936), 
which was transmitted to Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to become law on 
December 7, 2024.  
(c) Emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of 
the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  
 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium 
Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.