| 4 | + | ______________________________ 1 |
---|
| 5 | + | Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 2 |
---|
| 6 | + | 3 |
---|
| 7 | + | 4 |
---|
| 8 | + | 5 |
---|
| 9 | + | 6 |
---|
| 10 | + | 7 |
---|
| 11 | + | 8 |
---|
| 12 | + | 9 |
---|
| 13 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 10 |
---|
| 14 | + | 11 |
---|
| 15 | + | ________ 12 |
---|
| 16 | + | 13 |
---|
| 17 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 14 |
---|
| 18 | + | 15 |
---|
| 19 | + | ______________ 16 |
---|
| 20 | + | 17 |
---|
| 21 | + | 18 |
---|
| 22 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 19 |
---|
| 23 | + | to amend the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on voluntary 20 |
---|
| 24 | + | agreements. 21 |
---|
| 25 | + | 22 |
---|
| 26 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 23 |
---|
| 27 | + | may be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency 24 |
---|
| 28 | + | Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 25 |
---|
| 29 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the Council passed the Voluntary Agreement 26 |
---|
| 30 | + | Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25- 0517; 71 DCR 9351), 27 |
---|
| 31 | + | which was enacted on July 18, 2024, and expires on October 20, 2024. 28 |
---|
| 32 | + | (b) On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Voluntary Agreement 29 |
---|
| 33 | + | Moratorium Temporary Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25- 0531; 71 DCR 9936), 30 |
---|
| 34 | + | which was transmitted to Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to become law on 31 |
---|
| 35 | + | December 7, 2024. 32 |
---|
| 36 | + | (c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the 33 2 |
---|
6 | | - | |
---|
7 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
8 | | - | |
---|
9 | | - | 25-611 |
---|
10 | | - | |
---|
11 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
12 | | - | |
---|
13 | | - | September 17, 2024 |
---|
14 | | - | |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
17 | | - | to amend the Rental Housing Act of 1985 to maintain a moratorium on voluntary |
---|
18 | | - | agreements. |
---|
19 | | - | |
---|
20 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution |
---|
21 | | - | may be cited as the “Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency |
---|
22 | | - | Declaration Resolution of 2024”. |
---|
23 | | - | |
---|
24 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the Council passed the Voluntary Agreement |
---|
25 | | - | Moratorium Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-0517; 71 DCR 9351), |
---|
26 | | - | which was enacted on July 18, 2024, and expires on October 20, 2024. |
---|
27 | | - | (b) On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Voluntary Agreement |
---|
28 | | - | Moratorium Temporary Amendment Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-0531; 71 DCR 9936), |
---|
29 | | - | which was transmitted to Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to become law on |
---|
30 | | - | December 7, 2024. |
---|
31 | | - | (c) Emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration of |
---|
32 | | - | the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. |
---|
33 | | - | |
---|
34 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
35 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Voluntary Agreement Moratorium |
---|
36 | | - | Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 39 | + | expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 34 |
---|
| 40 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 35 |
---|
| 41 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the 36 |
---|
| 42 | + | Voluntary Agreement Moratorium Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 37 |
---|
| 43 | + | 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 38 |
---|
| 44 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 39 |
---|