District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0956 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/16/2024

                     
1 
 
  1 
______________________________2 
Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 3 
 4 
 5 
 6 
 7 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 
 9 
______________ 10 
 11 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 
 13 
________________                               14 
 15 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 16 
to continue existing requirements for providers of commercial or residential rental 17 
property to abide by agreed upon 	rent payment plans with eligible tenants. 18 
 19 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 20 
may be cited as the “Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review 21 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 22 
Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the passed the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation 23 
Emergency Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-	513; 71 DCR 9336), which was enacted on July 18, 24 
2024, and expires on October 16, 2024. 25 
(b) On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Tenant Payment Plan Phasing 26 
Continuation Temporary Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-	532; 71 DCR 9938), which was transmitted to 27 
Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to become law on December 7, 2024. 28 
(c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the 29 
expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  30 
Sec. 3.  The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 31 
enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Tenant 32   
2 
 
Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2024 must be 33 
adopted after a single reading. 34 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately. 35