District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0956 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/17/2024

                              	ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 
 
 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-610 
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
September 17, 2024 
                           
 
To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 
to continue existing requirements for providers of commercial or residential rental 
property to abide by agreed upon rent payment plans with eligible tenants. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 
may be cited as the “Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review 
Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
 
Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the passed the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation 
Emergency Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-513; 71 DCR 9336), which was enacted on July 18, 
2024, and expires on October 16, 2024. 
(b) On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Tenant Payment Plan Phasing 
Continuation Temporary Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-532; 71 DCR 9938), which was transmitted to 
Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to become law on December 7, 2024. 
(c) Emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration 
of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act.  
 
Sec. 3.  The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute 
emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing 
Continuation Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. 
 
Sec. 4.  This resolution shall take effect immediately.