| 4 | + | 1 |
---|
| 5 | + | ______________________________2 |
---|
| 6 | + | Councilmember Robert C. White, Jr. 3 |
---|
| 7 | + | 4 |
---|
| 8 | + | 5 |
---|
| 9 | + | 6 |
---|
| 10 | + | 7 |
---|
| 11 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 8 |
---|
| 12 | + | 9 |
---|
| 13 | + | ______________ 10 |
---|
| 14 | + | 11 |
---|
| 15 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 12 |
---|
| 16 | + | 13 |
---|
| 17 | + | ________________ 14 |
---|
| 18 | + | 15 |
---|
| 19 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need 16 |
---|
| 20 | + | to continue existing requirements for providers of commercial or residential rental 17 |
---|
| 21 | + | property to abide by agreed upon rent payment plans with eligible tenants. 18 |
---|
| 22 | + | 19 |
---|
| 23 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution 20 |
---|
| 24 | + | may be cited as the “Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review 21 |
---|
| 25 | + | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 22 |
---|
| 26 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the passed the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation 23 |
---|
| 27 | + | Emergency Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25- 513; 71 DCR 9336), which was enacted on July 18, 24 |
---|
| 28 | + | 2024, and expires on October 16, 2024. 25 |
---|
| 29 | + | (b) On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Tenant Payment Plan Phasing 26 |
---|
| 30 | + | Continuation Temporary Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25- 532; 71 DCR 9938), which was transmitted to 27 |
---|
| 31 | + | Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to become law on December 7, 2024. 28 |
---|
| 32 | + | (c) This emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the 29 |
---|
| 33 | + | expiration of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. 30 |
---|
| 34 | + | Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia determines that the circumstances 31 |
---|
| 35 | + | enumerated in section 2 constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Tenant 32 |
---|
| 36 | + | 2 |
---|
5 | | - | |
---|
6 | | - | |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | 25-610 |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | September 17, 2024 |
---|
15 | | - | |
---|
16 | | - | |
---|
17 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency, due to congressional review, with respect to the need |
---|
18 | | - | to continue existing requirements for providers of commercial or residential rental |
---|
19 | | - | property to abide by agreed upon rent payment plans with eligible tenants. |
---|
20 | | - | |
---|
21 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That this resolution |
---|
22 | | - | may be cited as the “Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review |
---|
23 | | - | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. |
---|
24 | | - | |
---|
25 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On June 25, 2024, the passed the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing Continuation |
---|
26 | | - | Emergency Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-513; 71 DCR 9336), which was enacted on July 18, |
---|
27 | | - | 2024, and expires on October 16, 2024. |
---|
28 | | - | (b) On July 9, 2024, the Council passed a corresponding Tenant Payment Plan Phasing |
---|
29 | | - | Continuation Temporary Act of 2024 (D.C. Act 25-532; 71 DCR 9938), which was transmitted to |
---|
30 | | - | Congress on August 6, 2024, and is projected to become law on December 7, 2024. |
---|
31 | | - | (c) Emergency legislation is necessary to prevent a gap in the law between the expiration |
---|
32 | | - | of the emergency act and the effective date of the temporary act. |
---|
33 | | - | |
---|
34 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 constitute |
---|
35 | | - | emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Tenant Payment Plan Phasing |
---|
36 | | - | Continuation Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2024 be adopted after a single reading. |
---|
37 | | - | |
---|
38 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 38 | + | Payment Plan Phasing Continuation Congressional Review Emergency Act of 2024 must be 33 |
---|
| 39 | + | adopted after a single reading. 34 |
---|
| 40 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 35 |
---|