Council | 11/08/2024 | Resolution R25-0693, Effective from Oct 29, 2024 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 013566 | ||
Council | 10/29/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0693 | ||
Council | 10/29/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 10/25/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 10/22/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0959 | ||
Council | 10/17/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 10/11/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 10/04/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/20/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0959 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 09/17/2024 | Referred to Committee on Health | ||
Council | 09/16/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |