District Of Columbia 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-0959 Introduced / Bill

Filed 09/16/2024

                    MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
Sep
tember 16, 2024 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of the D istrict of Columbia 
John A. Wilson 
Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 
Washington, DC 20004 
Dear Ch
airman M endelson: 
In accordance 
with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 214 of the District of Columbia Health 
Occupations Revision Act of 1985, effective March 25, 1986 (	D.C.
 Law 6-99; D.C. Official Code § 3-
1202.14), I am pleased to nominate the following individual:  
Ms. Carla Seals 
17th
 Street, NE 
Washington, DC 20018 
(Ward 5) 
f
or reappointment as a respiratory therapist licen	sed in the District member of t he Board 	of Respiratory 
Care, fo
r a term to end July 17, 2026. 
Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-m	entioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
Sincerely, 
Muriel B owser 
Mayor  ; ~ 
3 	at the request 	of the Mayor 
4 
5 
6 	A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
7 
8 
9 
10 	IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 To confirm the reappointment of Carla Seals to the Board of Respiratory Care. 
16 
17 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL 	OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 
18 resolution may be cited as the "Board of Respiratory Care Carla Seals Confirmation Resolution 
19 of 2024". 
20 Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment 	of: 
21 
22 	Ms. Carla Seals 
23 	17th Street, NE 
24 	Washington, DC 20018 
25 	(Ward 5) 
26 
27 
as a respiratory therapist licensed in the District member 	of the Board of Respiratory Care, 
28 established by section 214 	of the District of Columbia Health Occupations Revision Act 	of 1985, 
29 effective March 25, 1986 (D.C. Law 6-99; D.C. Official Code§ 3-1202.14), for a term to end 
30 July 17, 2027. 
31 Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
32 upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office 	of the Mayor. 
33 Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.  References Upon Request 
 
 
 
                                                                                                                                          
                                                                        Carla Seals                                                                                 
                                                                     
Summary of Qualifications  
 
 
Diligent, compassionate, and enthusiastic individual dedicated to providing exceptional patient care, leveraging my 
in-depth knowledge of various respiratory therapies, alongside education, and utilizing over 20 years of experience 
in all areas of respiratory care.  Member of AARC, equipped with the ability to interact professionally, respectfully 
and non-judgmental while being an effective communicator and patient advocate. Capable of establishing rapport 
whereas quickly building trust in order to assess, treat, and care for patients with breathing disorders and other 
respiratory related conditions requiring personalized respiratory care. Self-motivated and proficient in maintaining 
patient medical records for evaluating, updating and meeting sensitive deadlines to implement an appropriate 
patient care plan. Resourceful and teachable team player proven to function successfully by working to achieve 
standards though protecting, serving and meeting the needs of the patients through applying the Respiratory Care 
Practice Act and its guidelines; as it relates to the safe practices of respiratory care. 
 
Skills 
 
 Problem Resolution   
 Infection Control 
Standards 
 Hemodynamics  
 Advanced Cardiac Life         
Support (ACLS) 
 Mechanical Ventilation                                                                                                      
  Intubation   
  Treatment Planning  
  Flow Sheet     
    Charting 
  Airway Management
 
Experience 
 
 
 
 Professionally follow physician orders and implement patient plan of care. 
 Enthusiastically provide basic therapeutics needs and bedside spirometry. 
 Compassionately educate patient and family members appropriately according to protocol and plan of care.  
 Passionately treat, manage and rehabilitate patients with breathing and other cardiopulmonary disorders. 
 Perform bronchopulmonary hygiene technique such as vest airway clearance system, PEP mask therapy 
and coughing exercises.  
 Efficiently administer nebulizer treatments, oxygen therapy, and full trach care.  
 Successfully perform airway management. 
 Effectively evaluate, assess, medical records and plan of care. 
 Skillfully monitor and place neonates on mechanical vents including BiPAP and CPAP machines.  
 Diligently assist with bronchoscopes and Laryngoscopes procedure. 
 Thoroughly administer bronchodilators to pediatric patients, monitor hemodynamics in adult ICU and assist 
in pulmonary rehabilitations.   
 Cautiously assist with the transporting of patients to acute care hospitals and intubate as needed. 
 Successfully perform oxygen therapy via proper device such as nasal cannula, non-rebreather, simple mask 
and air entrainment mask.   
 Accurately monitor tube cuff pressure, equipment, breathing sounds and vital signs.  
 Tactfully transform patient issues and family concerns to a satisfactory resolution and positive outcome.    
 Properly set-up and work with mechanical ventilator.     
 
Work History 
 
 
 
Bridge Point Hospital (Washington, DC)                        Lead Therapist                                    10/2002 - Present 
Greater Southeast Hospital (Washington, DC)              Staff Therapist                                     01/1989 - 01/2004 
 
Education 
 
 
 
 B.A., Health Care Administration, August 2012 
        University of Phoenix 
 A.A.S., Respiratory Care Practitioner, December 1988  
       University of the District of Columbia  
                                                                               Washington, DC  202.526.0506   ckjs1919@gmail.com      
Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
 
Carla Seals 
 
Ms. Carla Seals is a Lead Therapist at Bridge Point Hospital. Ms. Seals 
is dedicated to providing exceptional patient care by leveraging her in-
depth knowledge of various procedures and her over 20 years of 
experience in respiratory care. Ms. Seals gained knowledge and 
experience over the years while she worked at several local hospitals 
holding positions as both a lead and staff therapist. Ms. Seals has a 
passion for educating her patients on diseases that affect their lungs and 
heart, and she provides patients with individualized respiratory care 
plans.  
A Ward 5 resident, Ms. Seals received an Associate of Applied Science 
in Respiratory Care Practitioner from the University of the District of Columbia and a Bachelor of 
Arts in Health Care Administration from the University of Phoenix.  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
 
 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724-7681 
 
To:   Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker 
From:   Betsy Cavendish 
Date:   May 20, 2024 
Subject:  Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Carla Seals and Ivana 
Milojevic as members of the Board of Respiratory Care   
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and 
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-
724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. 
 
 
______________________________ 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish