MURIEL BOWSER MAYOR October 10, 2024 The Honorable Phil Mendelson Chairman Council of the District of Columbia John A. Wilson Building 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 Washington, DC 20004 Dear Chairman Mendelson: In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2- 142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 102 of the Racial Equity Achieves Results (REACH) Amendment Act of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. Law 23-181; D.C. Official Code § 2-1471.02), I am pleased to nominate the following individual: Lamont Mitchell Bangor Street, SE Washington, DC 20020 (Ward 7) for reappointment as a member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, for a term to end December 17, 2026. Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments, should the Council require additional information. Sincerely, Muriel Bowser Mayor 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 29 30 31 32 ZI:1!:::::: at the request of the Mayor A PROPOSED RESOLUTION IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA To confirm the reappointment of Lamont Mitchell to the Racial Equity Advisory Board. RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this resolution may be cited as the "Racial Equity Advisory Board Lamont Mitchell Confirmation Resolution of 2024". Sec. 2. The Council of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of: Lamont Mitchell Bangor Street, SE Washington, DC 20020 (Ward 7) as a member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, established by section 102 of the Racial Equity Achieves Results (REACH) Amendment Act of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. Law 23-181; D.C. Official Code§ 2-1471.02), for a term to end December 17, 2026. Sec. 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution, upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office of the Mayor. Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. LAMONTB.MITCHELL SUMMARY: Experiencedmanagerandformerlocalsmallbusinessownerwithstrongfinancialandprogram managementskillsanddecades-longcommitmentandreccrdofplanning,promotingand implementingcommunityeconomicdevelopmentandsocialsupportprojectsforeastofthe AnacostiaRivercommunitiesinWashington,D.C. EXPERIENCE: AnacostiaCoordinatingCouncil BoardChairandInterimOperationsDirector2019-present;BoardVice-Chair2004-2019 Vanita’sPot-President.2020-present A801-3corganizationdedicatedtoprovidingfreshmealstoSeniorsandunhousedresidentsin economicallychallengedareasinWashington,DCandadvocatingforresidentslivinginfocd deserts. ImaniCatering,Inc.-Owner&GeneralManager1992-2020 DistrictofColumbiaGovernmentExecutiveOfficeoftheMayor-EastoftheRiver RevitalizationCoordinator1999-2001(Cabinetlevel) ServedasprojectcoordinatorforallongoingprojectsineastoftheAnacostiariver; RecommendedpoliciesfortheExecutiveOfficeoftheMayorbasedanMayoraldirectivesand Congressionalmandates,communities;coordinatedconimunilyinputonre-developmentplas. EDUCATION: HowardUniversitySchoolofBusiness,BBA,Accounting,1988 Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvan ia Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 Lamont Mitchell Mr. Lamont Mitchell serves as the Board Chair and Interim Director of Operations for the Anacostia Coordinating Council (ACC). The Anacostia Coordinating Council was established in 1983 as a volunteer membership consortium of organizations and individuals involved with the revitalization of Anacostia and its adjacent neighborhoods. The ACC is involved in information gathering and sharing, networking, advocacy, and community organizing. It has welcomed over 100 guest speakers to its monthly meetings to discuss some of the community’s most urgent issues. Mr. Mitchell has also served as the Vice Chair of ACC. In this role, he was responsible for long range planning and led the ACC monthly information share meeting. Prior to ACC, Mr. Mitchell was the founder and General Manager of the Imani Café and Catering Company. In 2020, Mr. Mitchell retired and started to advise food service start-ups. He is also a current member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board. A Ward 8 resident, Mr. Mitchell earned his Bachelor of Business Administration from Howard University. GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor ______________________________________________________________________________ The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681 To: Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker From: Betsy Cavendish Date: September 16, 2024 Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Shareefah Al’Uqdah, David Coleman, Kelly Crawford, Kenya Hutton, Yolanda Lewis, Vivian Lowery Derrick, Lamont Mitchell, and Gabrielle Parsons as members of the Racial Equity Advisory Board This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and found them to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202- 724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. ______________________________ Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish