District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-1017 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 10/10/2024

                             
 
 
MURIEL BOWSER 
MAYOR 
 
 
October 10, 2024 
 
The Honorable Phil Mendelson  
Chairman 
Council of the District of Columbia 
John A. Wilson Building 
1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504  
Washington, DC 20004 
 
Dear Chairman Mendelson: 
 
In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2-
142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 102 of the Racial Equity Achieves Results 
(REACH) Amendment Act of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. Law 23-181; D.C. Official Code 
§ 2-1471.02), I am pleased to nominate the following individual:  
 
Lamont Mitchell 
Bangor Street, SE  
Washington, DC 20020  
(Ward 7)  
 
for reappointment as a member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, for a term to end December 17, 
2026. 
 
Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned 
nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process.  
 
I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please 
do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and 
Appointments, should the Council require additional information.  
 
Sincerely,  
 
 
 
Muriel Bowser 
Mayor  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
25 
26 
27 
28 
29 
30 
31 
32 
ZI:1!:::::: 
at the request of the Mayor 
A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
To confirm the reappointment 
of Lamont Mitchell to the Racial Equity Advisory Board. 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this 
resolution may be cited as the "Racial Equity Advisory Board Lamont Mitchell Confirmation 
Resolution 
of 2024". 
Sec. 2. The Council 
of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment 	of: 
Lamont Mitchell 
Bangor Street, SE 
Washington, DC 20020 
(Ward 7) 
as a member 
of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, established by section 102 	of the Racial 
Equity Achieves Results (REACH) Amendment Act 
of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. 
Law 23-181; D.C. Official 
Code§ 2-1471.02), for a term to end December 	17, 2026. 
Sec. 
3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy 	of this resolution, 
upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office 
of the Mayor. 
Sec. 
4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.   LAMONTB.MITCHELL
SUMMARY:
Experiencedmanagerandformerlocalsmallbusinessownerwithstrongfinancialandprogram
managementskillsanddecades-longcommitmentandreccrdofplanning,promotingand
implementingcommunityeconomicdevelopmentandsocialsupportprojectsforeastofthe
AnacostiaRivercommunitiesinWashington,D.C.
EXPERIENCE:
AnacostiaCoordinatingCouncil
BoardChairandInterimOperationsDirector2019-present;BoardVice-Chair2004-2019
Vanita’sPot-President.2020-present
A801-3corganizationdedicatedtoprovidingfreshmealstoSeniorsandunhousedresidentsin
economicallychallengedareasinWashington,DCandadvocatingforresidentslivinginfocd
deserts.
ImaniCatering,Inc.-Owner&GeneralManager1992-2020
DistrictofColumbiaGovernmentExecutiveOfficeoftheMayor-EastoftheRiver
RevitalizationCoordinator1999-2001(Cabinetlevel)
ServedasprojectcoordinatorforallongoingprojectsineastoftheAnacostiariver;
RecommendedpoliciesfortheExecutiveOfficeoftheMayorbasedanMayoraldirectivesand
Congressionalmandates,communities;coordinatedconimunilyinputonre-developmentplas.
EDUCATION:
HowardUniversitySchoolofBusiness,BBA,Accounting,1988   
Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments 
John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvan ia Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 
 
   
 
 
Lamont Mitchell 
 
Mr. Lamont Mitchell serves as the Board Chair and Interim Director of 
Operations for the Anacostia Coordinating Council (ACC). The 
Anacostia Coordinating Council was established in 1983 as a volunteer 
membership consortium of organizations and individuals involved with 
the revitalization of Anacostia and its adjacent neighborhoods. The 
ACC is involved in information gathering and sharing, networking, 
advocacy, and community organizing. It has welcomed over 100 guest 
speakers to its monthly meetings to discuss some of the community’s 
most urgent issues.  
Mr. Mitchell has also served as the Vice Chair of ACC. In this role, he 
was responsible for long range planning and led the ACC monthly information share meeting. 
Prior to ACC, Mr. Mitchell was the founder and General Manager of the Imani Café and Catering 
Company. In 2020, Mr. Mitchell retired and started to advise food service start-ups. He is also a 
current member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board. 
A Ward 8 resident, Mr. Mitchell earned his Bachelor of Business 	Administration from Howard 
University.  GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser 
Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor 
______________________________________________________________________________ 
The John A. Wilson Building     •    1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW     •     Suite 300    •   Washington, D.C.  20004     •    Office (202) 724-7681 
To: Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker 
From: Betsy Cavendish 
Date: September 16, 2024 
Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Shareefah Al’Uqdah, David 
Coleman, Kelly Crawford, Kenya Hutton, Yolanda Lewis, Vivian Lowery 
Derrick, Lamont Mitchell, and Gabrielle Parsons as members of the Racial Equity 
Advisory Board 
This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and
found them to be legally unobjectionable.  If you have any questions in this regard, please do not 
hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202-
724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681.
______________________________ 
Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish