1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | MURIEL BOWSER |
---|
5 | 5 | | MAYOR |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | October 10, 2024 |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | The Honorable Phil Mendelson |
---|
11 | 11 | | Chairman |
---|
12 | 12 | | Council of the District of Columbia |
---|
13 | 13 | | John A. Wilson Building |
---|
14 | 14 | | 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 504 |
---|
15 | 15 | | Washington, DC 20004 |
---|
16 | 16 | | |
---|
17 | 17 | | Dear Chairman Mendelson: |
---|
18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | In accordance with section 2 of the Confirmation Act of 1978, effective March 3, 1979 (D.C. Law 2- |
---|
20 | 20 | | 142; D.C. Official Code § 1-523.01), and pursuant to section 102 of the Racial Equity Achieves Results |
---|
21 | 21 | | (REACH) Amendment Act of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. Law 23-181; D.C. Official Code |
---|
22 | 22 | | § 2-1471.02), I am pleased to nominate the following individual: |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | Lamont Mitchell |
---|
25 | 25 | | Bangor Street, SE |
---|
26 | 26 | | Washington, DC 20020 |
---|
27 | 27 | | (Ward 7) |
---|
28 | 28 | | |
---|
29 | 29 | | for reappointment as a member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, for a term to end December 17, |
---|
30 | 30 | | 2026. |
---|
31 | 31 | | |
---|
32 | 32 | | Enclosed, you will find biographical information detailing the experience of the above-mentioned |
---|
33 | 33 | | nominee, together with a proposed resolution to assist the Council during the confirmation process. |
---|
34 | 34 | | |
---|
35 | 35 | | I would appreciate the Council’s earliest consideration of this nomination for confirmation. Please |
---|
36 | 36 | | do not hesitate to contact me, or Steven Walker, Director, Mayor’s Office of Talent and |
---|
37 | 37 | | Appointments, should the Council require additional information. |
---|
38 | 38 | | |
---|
39 | 39 | | Sincerely, |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | Muriel Bowser |
---|
44 | 44 | | Mayor 1 |
---|
45 | 45 | | 2 |
---|
46 | 46 | | 3 |
---|
47 | 47 | | 4 |
---|
48 | 48 | | 5 |
---|
49 | 49 | | 6 |
---|
50 | 50 | | 7 |
---|
51 | 51 | | 8 |
---|
52 | 52 | | 9 |
---|
53 | 53 | | 10 |
---|
54 | 54 | | 11 |
---|
55 | 55 | | 12 |
---|
56 | 56 | | 13 |
---|
57 | 57 | | 14 |
---|
58 | 58 | | 15 |
---|
59 | 59 | | 16 |
---|
60 | 60 | | 17 |
---|
61 | 61 | | 18 |
---|
62 | 62 | | 19 |
---|
63 | 63 | | 20 |
---|
64 | 64 | | 21 |
---|
65 | 65 | | 22 |
---|
66 | 66 | | 23 |
---|
67 | 67 | | 24 |
---|
68 | 68 | | 25 |
---|
69 | 69 | | 26 |
---|
70 | 70 | | 27 |
---|
71 | 71 | | 28 |
---|
72 | 72 | | 29 |
---|
73 | 73 | | 30 |
---|
74 | 74 | | 31 |
---|
75 | 75 | | 32 |
---|
76 | 76 | | ZI:1!:::::: |
---|
77 | 77 | | at the request of the Mayor |
---|
78 | 78 | | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION |
---|
79 | 79 | | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
80 | 80 | | To confirm the reappointment |
---|
81 | 81 | | of Lamont Mitchell to the Racial Equity Advisory Board. |
---|
82 | 82 | | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, that this |
---|
83 | 83 | | resolution may be cited as the "Racial Equity Advisory Board Lamont Mitchell Confirmation |
---|
84 | 84 | | Resolution |
---|
85 | 85 | | of 2024". |
---|
86 | 86 | | Sec. 2. The Council |
---|
87 | 87 | | of the District of Columbia confirms the reappointment of: |
---|
88 | 88 | | Lamont Mitchell |
---|
89 | 89 | | Bangor Street, SE |
---|
90 | 90 | | Washington, DC 20020 |
---|
91 | 91 | | (Ward 7) |
---|
92 | 92 | | as a member |
---|
93 | 93 | | of the Racial Equity Advisory Board, established by section 102 of the Racial |
---|
94 | 94 | | Equity Achieves Results (REACH) Amendment Act |
---|
95 | 95 | | of 2020, effective March 16, 2021 (D.C. |
---|
96 | 96 | | Law 23-181; D.C. Official |
---|
97 | 97 | | Code§ 2-1471.02), for a term to end December 17, 2026. |
---|
98 | 98 | | Sec. |
---|
99 | 99 | | 3. The Council of the District of Columbia shall transmit a copy of this resolution, |
---|
100 | 100 | | upon its adoption, to the nominee and to the Office |
---|
101 | 101 | | of the Mayor. |
---|
102 | 102 | | Sec. |
---|
103 | 103 | | 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. LAMONTB.MITCHELL |
---|
104 | 104 | | SUMMARY: |
---|
105 | 105 | | Experiencedmanagerandformerlocalsmallbusinessownerwithstrongfinancialandprogram |
---|
106 | 106 | | managementskillsanddecades-longcommitmentandreccrdofplanning,promotingand |
---|
107 | 107 | | implementingcommunityeconomicdevelopmentandsocialsupportprojectsforeastofthe |
---|
108 | 108 | | AnacostiaRivercommunitiesinWashington,D.C. |
---|
109 | 109 | | EXPERIENCE: |
---|
110 | 110 | | AnacostiaCoordinatingCouncil |
---|
111 | 111 | | BoardChairandInterimOperationsDirector2019-present;BoardVice-Chair2004-2019 |
---|
112 | 112 | | Vanita’sPot-President.2020-present |
---|
113 | 113 | | A801-3corganizationdedicatedtoprovidingfreshmealstoSeniorsandunhousedresidentsin |
---|
114 | 114 | | economicallychallengedareasinWashington,DCandadvocatingforresidentslivinginfocd |
---|
115 | 115 | | deserts. |
---|
116 | 116 | | ImaniCatering,Inc.-Owner&GeneralManager1992-2020 |
---|
117 | 117 | | DistrictofColumbiaGovernmentExecutiveOfficeoftheMayor-EastoftheRiver |
---|
118 | 118 | | RevitalizationCoordinator1999-2001(Cabinetlevel) |
---|
119 | 119 | | ServedasprojectcoordinatorforallongoingprojectsineastoftheAnacostiariver; |
---|
120 | 120 | | RecommendedpoliciesfortheExecutiveOfficeoftheMayorbasedanMayoraldirectivesand |
---|
121 | 121 | | Congressionalmandates,communities;coordinatedconimunilyinputonre-developmentplas. |
---|
122 | 122 | | EDUCATION: |
---|
123 | 123 | | HowardUniversitySchoolofBusiness,BBA,Accounting,1988 |
---|
124 | 124 | | Executive Office of the Mayor – Mayor’s Office of Talent and Appointments |
---|
125 | 125 | | John A. Wilson Building | 1350 Pennsylvan ia Avenue, Suite 600 | Washington, DC 20004 |
---|
126 | 126 | | |
---|
127 | 127 | | |
---|
128 | 128 | | |
---|
129 | 129 | | |
---|
130 | 130 | | Lamont Mitchell |
---|
131 | 131 | | |
---|
132 | 132 | | Mr. Lamont Mitchell serves as the Board Chair and Interim Director of |
---|
133 | 133 | | Operations for the Anacostia Coordinating Council (ACC). The |
---|
134 | 134 | | Anacostia Coordinating Council was established in 1983 as a volunteer |
---|
135 | 135 | | membership consortium of organizations and individuals involved with |
---|
136 | 136 | | the revitalization of Anacostia and its adjacent neighborhoods. The |
---|
137 | 137 | | ACC is involved in information gathering and sharing, networking, |
---|
138 | 138 | | advocacy, and community organizing. It has welcomed over 100 guest |
---|
139 | 139 | | speakers to its monthly meetings to discuss some of the community’s |
---|
140 | 140 | | most urgent issues. |
---|
141 | 141 | | Mr. Mitchell has also served as the Vice Chair of ACC. In this role, he |
---|
142 | 142 | | was responsible for long range planning and led the ACC monthly information share meeting. |
---|
143 | 143 | | Prior to ACC, Mr. Mitchell was the founder and General Manager of the Imani Café and Catering |
---|
144 | 144 | | Company. In 2020, Mr. Mitchell retired and started to advise food service start-ups. He is also a |
---|
145 | 145 | | current member of the Racial Equity Advisory Board. |
---|
146 | 146 | | A Ward 8 resident, Mr. Mitchell earned his Bachelor of Business Administration from Howard |
---|
147 | 147 | | University. GOVERNMENT OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
148 | 148 | | Executive Office of Mayor Muriel Bowser |
---|
149 | 149 | | Office of the General Counsel to the Mayor |
---|
150 | 150 | | ______________________________________________________________________________ |
---|
151 | 151 | | The John A. Wilson Building • 1350 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW • Suite 300 • Washington, D.C. 20004 • Office (202) 724-7681 |
---|
152 | 152 | | To: Tomas Talamante, Steve Walker |
---|
153 | 153 | | From: Betsy Cavendish |
---|
154 | 154 | | Date: September 16, 2024 |
---|
155 | 155 | | Subject: Legal sufficiency review of Resolutions nominating Shareefah Al’Uqdah, David |
---|
156 | 156 | | Coleman, Kelly Crawford, Kenya Hutton, Yolanda Lewis, Vivian Lowery |
---|
157 | 157 | | Derrick, Lamont Mitchell, and Gabrielle Parsons as members of the Racial Equity |
---|
158 | 158 | | Advisory Board |
---|
159 | 159 | | This is to Certify that this office has reviewed the above-referenced resolutions and |
---|
160 | 160 | | found them to be legally unobjectionable. If you have any questions in this regard, please do not |
---|
161 | 161 | | hesitate to call Erika Satterlee, Deputy General Counsel, Executive Office of the Mayor, at 202- |
---|
162 | 162 | | 724-1303, or me at 202-724-7681. |
---|
163 | 163 | | ______________________________ |
---|
164 | 164 | | Elizabeth A. (Betsy) Cavendish |
---|