Council | 11/26/2024 | Final Reading, CC | ||
Council | 11/26/2024 | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0716 | ||
Council | 11/20/2024 | Committee Report Filed | ||
Council | 11/18/2024 | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary | ||
Council | 11/18/2024 | Committee Mark-up of PR25-1046 | ||
Council | 11/13/2024 | Public Hearing Held | ||
Council | 11/08/2024 | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 11/01/2024 | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-1046 Published in the DC Register | ||
Council | 10/29/2024 | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development | ||
Council | 10/24/2024 | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |