6 | | - | A RESOLUTION |
---|
7 | | - | |
---|
8 | | - | 25-741 |
---|
9 | | - | |
---|
10 | | - | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA |
---|
11 | | - | |
---|
12 | | - | December 3, 2024 |
---|
13 | | - | |
---|
14 | | - | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to continue the |
---|
15 | | - | extension of the Streatery Program endorsements through July 31, 2025 and to clarify endorsement deadlines for certain classes of licensees ; and to amend the |
---|
16 | | - | Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to make a |
---|
17 | | - | clarifying amendment. |
---|
18 | | - | |
---|
19 | | - | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That |
---|
20 | | - | this resolution may be cited as the “Streatery Program Endorsement Extension Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. |
---|
21 | | - | Sec. 2. (a) On March 5, 2024, the Council enacted the Streatery Program and |
---|
22 | | - | Endorsement Deadline Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, (D.C. Act 25- 414; 71 DCR |
---|
23 | | - | 3495), and the Streatery Program and Endorsement Deadline Temporary Amendment Act |
---|
24 | | - | of 2024, effective June 1, 2024 ( D.C. Law 25- 170; 71 DCR 7001) (“temporary |
---|
25 | | - | legislation”), to allow licensed establishments that register with the Alcoholic Beverage |
---|
26 | | - | and Cannabis Board to offer beer, wine, or spirits for sale on expanded outdoor space until December 31, 2024 (“Streatery Program”). |
---|
27 | | - | (b) The District Department of Transportation (“DDOT”) is currently developing |
---|
28 | | - | regulations to support a permanent Streatery Program that will allow food establishments to occupy public space for outdoor dining in the long- term. DDOT extended its |
---|
29 | | - | temporary program until July 31, 2025, when it intends for the permanent program to be |
---|
30 | | - | in place. |
---|
31 | | - | (c) Permanent legislation addressing Streatery Program endorsements has been |
---|
32 | | - | introduced but must complete the legislative process. |
---|
33 | | - | (d) It is necessary that the provisions of the temporary legislation continue |
---|
34 | | - | without interruption until the permanent legislation is in effect . |
---|
35 | | - | (e) It is also important to immediately amend the Legalization of Marijuana for |
---|
36 | | - | Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to clarify geographic requirements for license |
---|
37 | | - | holders and applicants. |
---|
38 | | - | ENROLLED ORIGINAL |
---|
39 | | - | |
---|
40 | | - | |
---|
41 | | - | |
---|
42 | | - | 2 |
---|
43 | | - | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 |
---|
44 | | - | constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Streatery Program Endorsement Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single |
---|
45 | | - | reading. |
---|
46 | | - | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. |
---|
| 2 | + | 1 |
---|
| 3 | + | ______________________________ 2 |
---|
| 4 | + | Councilmember Kenyan R. McDuffie 3 |
---|
| 5 | + | 4 |
---|
| 6 | + | 5 |
---|
| 7 | + | 6 |
---|
| 8 | + | A PROPOSED RESOLUTION 7 |
---|
| 9 | + | _________________ 8 |
---|
| 10 | + | 9 |
---|
| 11 | + | IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 10 |
---|
| 12 | + | _________________________ 11 |
---|
| 13 | + | 12 |
---|
| 14 | + | To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to continue the 13 |
---|
| 15 | + | extension of the Streatery Program endorsements through July 31, 2025 and to 14 |
---|
| 16 | + | clarify endorsement deadlines for certain classes of licensees; and to amend the 15 |
---|
| 17 | + | Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to make a 16 |
---|
| 18 | + | clarifying amendment. 17 |
---|
| 19 | + | 18 |
---|
| 20 | + | RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 19 |
---|
| 21 | + | this resolution may be cited as the “Streatery Program Endorsement Extension 20 |
---|
| 22 | + | Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 21 |
---|
| 23 | + | 22 |
---|
| 24 | + | Sec. 2. (a) On March 5, 2024, the Council enacted the Streatery Program and 23 |
---|
| 25 | + | Endorsement Deadline Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, (D.C. Act 25-414; 71 DCR 24 |
---|
| 26 | + | 3495), and the Streatery Program and Endorsement Deadline Temporary Amendment Act 25 |
---|
| 27 | + | of 2024, effective June 1, 2024 (D.C. Law 25-170; 71 DCR 7001) (“temporary 26 |
---|
| 28 | + | legislation”), to allow licensed establishments that register with the Alcoholic Beverage 27 |
---|
| 29 | + | and Cannabis Board to offer beer, wine, or spirits for sale on expanded outdoor space 28 |
---|
| 30 | + | until December 31, 2024 (“Streatery Program”). 29 |
---|
| 31 | + | (b) The District Department of Transportation (“DDOT”) is currently 30 |
---|
| 32 | + | developing regulations to support a permanent Streatery Program that will allow food 31 |
---|
| 33 | + | establishments to occupy public space for outdoor dining in the long-term. DDOT 32 |
---|
| 34 | + | extended its temporary program until July 31, 2025, when it intends for the permanent 33 |
---|
| 35 | + | program to be in place. 34 2 |
---|
| 36 | + | (c) Permanent legislation addressing Streatery Program endorsements has been 35 |
---|
| 37 | + | introduced but must complete the legislative process. 36 |
---|
| 38 | + | (d) It is necessary that the provisions of the temporary legislation continue 37 |
---|
| 39 | + | without interruption, until the permanent legislation is in effect. 38 |
---|
| 40 | + | (e) It is also important to immediately amend the Legalization of Marijuana for 39 |
---|
| 41 | + | Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to clarify geographic requirements for license 40 |
---|
| 42 | + | holders and applicants. 41 |
---|
| 43 | + | Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 42 |
---|
| 44 | + | constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Streatery Program 43 |
---|
| 45 | + | Endorsement Extension Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single 44 |
---|
| 46 | + | reading. 45 |
---|
| 47 | + | Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately. 46 |
---|