District Of Columbia 2023-2024 Regular Session

District Of Columbia Council Bill PR25-1079 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 12/03/2024

                              ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	1 
A RESOLUTION 
  
25-741  
 
IN THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA 
 
December 3, 2024 
  
To declare the existence of an emergency with respect to the need to continue the 
extension of the Streatery Program endorsements through July 31, 2025 and to 	clarify endorsement deadlines for certain classes of licensees	; and to amend the 
Legalization of Marijuana for Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to make a 
clarifying amendment. 
 
RESOLVED, BY THE COUNCIL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, That 
this resolution may be cited as the “Streatery Program Endorsement Extension 	Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024”. 
 	Sec. 2. (a) On March 5, 2024, the Council enacted the Streatery Program and 
Endorsement Deadline Emergency Amendment Act of 2024, (D.C. Act 25-	414; 71 DCR 
3495), and the Streatery Program and Endorsement Deadline Temporary Amendment Act 
of 2024, effective June 1, 2024 (	D.C. Law 25- 170; 71 DCR 7001) (“temporary 
legislation”), to allow licensed establishments that register with the Alcoholic Beverage 
and Cannabis Board to offer beer, wine, or spirits for sale on expanded outdoor space 	until December 31, 2024 (“Streatery Program”).  
      (b) The District Department of Transportation (“DDOT”) is currently developing 
regulations to support a permanent Streatery Program that will allow food establishments 	to occupy public space for outdoor dining in the long-	term. DDOT extended its 
temporary program until July 31, 2025, when it intends for the permanent program to be 
in place. 
(c) Permanent legislation addressing Streatery Program endorsements has been 
introduced but must complete the legislative process. 
(d) It is necessary that the provisions of the temporary legislation continue 
without interruption until the permanent legislation is in effect . 
(e) It is also important to immediately amend the Legalization of Marijuana for 
Medical Treatment Initiative of 1999 to clarify geographic requirements for license 
holders and applicants. 
      ENROLLED ORIGINAL 
 
 
 
 	2 
Sec. 3. The Council determines that the circumstances enumerated in section 2 
constitute emergency circumstances making it necessary that the Streatery Program 	Endorsement Extension 	Emergency Amendment Act of 2024 be adopted after a single 
reading. 
 	Sec. 4. This resolution shall take effect immediately.