10/09/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/20/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |||
05/22/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |||
03/28/2024 | Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate | |||
03/28/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |||
03/28/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 277 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
02/29/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 277 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/23/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 Favorable | |||
01/09/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |