LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB81
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB81
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB81
Action History
05/12/2023
Signed by Governor
05/09/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO
04/05/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 8 Favorable
03/28/2023
Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
03/28/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
03/15/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 7 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
03/09/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House