09/05/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/26/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 5 NO | |||
06/26/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/18/2024 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
06/18/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/11/2024 | Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate | |||
06/11/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 23 YES 14 NO 4 ABSENT | |||
06/11/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 9 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
05/22/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/01/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 9 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/11/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
05/10/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources & Energy) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |||
05/02/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House |