Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware House Bill HCR90

Introduced
3/12/24  
Introduced
3/12/24  

Caption

Designating March 12, 2024 As "equal Pay Day" In The State Of Delaware.

Impact

The designation of 'Equal Pay Day' aims to raise awareness of the wage gap and its implications on women's economic standing and their ability to meet everyday financial burdens, such as student debt, mortgage payments, and childcare costs. Support for this resolution comes in light of previous legislative actions aimed at promoting fair pay practices, including policies requiring state contracts to certify equal pay for equal work. The resolution serves as a reminder of the continuous efforts needed to address gender-based wage discrimination at both state and federal levels.

Summary

House Concurrent Resolution No. 90 designates March 12, 2024, as 'Equal Pay Day' in the State of Delaware. This resolution highlights the ongoing issue of pay disparity between men and women, emphasizing that women, especially those of color and single mothers, continue to face significant wage gaps even more than 50 years after the enactment of the Equal Pay Act. The resolution cites that, in Delaware, women working full-time earn an average of 82% of their male counterparts. For women of color, the statistics are even more concerning, with Black and Hispanic women earning only 61% of what white men earn, and white women earning 81% of that same figure.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding the resolution is positive, although it brings to light the frustrations of many regarding the slow progress towards pay equity. Supporters, including legislative sponsors and advocacy groups, are hopeful that acknowledging this day will spur further action regarding gender wage disparity. Conversely, the resolution also signifies the need for continued attention to the systemic issues that contribute to the wage gap, with varying perspectives on how effectively these issues are being addressed.

Contention

While the resolution itself is largely symbolic and non-controversial, it does touch upon ongoing discussions regarding legislative measures aimed at closing the wage gap. Some might argue that more concrete actions are needed beyond recognizing a designated day, such as stronger enforcement of existing pay equity laws or legislation that directly addresses the systemic barriers women face in the workforce. The tension between symbolic gestures and actionable change remains a point of contention among lawmakers and advocates alike.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

DE HCR24

Recognizing April 25, 2023, As "delaware Teach Children To Save Day".

DE HCR49

Recognizing May 20, 2023, As "armed Forces Day".

DE HCR100

Recognizing May 10th As Major George S. Welch Day.

DE HCR73

Recognizing June 25th-july 1st, 2023 As "deafblind Awareness Week

DE HCR128

Recognizing May 6-10, 2024, As "teacher Appreciation Week" In The State Of Delaware.

DE HCR44

Recognizing May 8-12, 2023 As "teacher Appreciation Week".

DE HCR163

Honoring The Marine Corps 249th Birthday On November 10, 2024.

DE HCR53

Recognizing May 2023 As "foster Care Month" In The State Of Delaware.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.