06/20/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
05/23/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
03/27/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |||
02/29/2024 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
01/25/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
01/24/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |||
01/18/2024 | Re-Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |||
01/17/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |