LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB211
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB211
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB211
Action History
04/17/2024
Not Worked in Committee
03/27/2024
Assigned to Education Committee in House
03/26/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 6 NO
03/13/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
01/24/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate