LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB46
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB46
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB46
Action History
09/21/2023
Signed by Governor
06/20/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
06/14/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
05/03/2023
Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
05/02/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
04/26/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
04/19/2023
Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 46, and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate