|
08/22/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT
|
|
|
|
06/22/2023
|
Passed By House. Votes: 29 YES 11 NO 1 ABSENT
|
|
|
|
06/22/2023
|
Amendment HA 4 to SB 51 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
|
|
|
|
06/22/2023
|
Amendment HA 3 to SB 51 - Stricken in House
|
|
|
|
06/22/2023
|
Amendment HA 2 to SB 51 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
|
|
|
|
06/22/2023
|
Amendment HA 1 to SB 51 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
|
|
|
|
06/22/2023
|
Amendment HA 4 to SB 51 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
06/01/2023
|
Amendment HA 3 to SB 51 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Amendment HA 2 to SB 51 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment HA 1 to SB 51 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 7 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
|
|
|
|
04/20/2023
|
Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
|
|
|
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 5 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
|
|
|
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 5 Favorable
|
|
|
|
02/17/2023
|
Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate
|
|
|