House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 288
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted SB 288
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/23/2021
|
Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
09/17/2021
|
Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/17/2021
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
09/17/2021
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/17/2021
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
08/10/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|