House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Favorable by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
PCS added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
09/22/2021
|
Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/22/2021
|
Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|