Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0101 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 27, 2022