House
|
03/08/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 196
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Favorable by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/23/2021
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2021
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2021
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
09/20/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|