Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0137 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 28, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis December 1, 2021
Analysis November 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2022