House
|
03/01/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 254
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Substituted CS/SB 254
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Reported out of Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Added to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Now in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Referred to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
09/30/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|