Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0215 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 29, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 19, 2022