House | 03/04/2022 | Laid on Table, refer to SB 222 | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Substituted SB 222 | ||
House | 03/01/2022 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022) | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Reported out of Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Favorable by Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Added to Commerce Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/02/2021 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 12/02/2021 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/02/2021 | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/23/2021 | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 10/22/2021 | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/22/2021 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 10/22/2021 | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/12/2021 | Filed |