Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0317 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 15, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis November 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill January 20, 2022