|
05/04/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-85
|
|
|
|
05/03/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/03/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1182
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|