Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0381 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2022
Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 17, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 26, 2022