House
|
03/07/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 598
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Now in Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/23/2021
|
Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|