Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0385 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 5, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis November 23, 2021