Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0395 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2022
Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 17, 2022