|
06/09/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for CS/SB 552
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|