Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0397 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 22, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 4, 2022