Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 107, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/24/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/27/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|