LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
H0413
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H0413
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H0413
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
October 27, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
January 25, 2022
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
January 25, 2022
Analysis
January 23, 2022
Analysis
January 13, 2022
Analysis
January 11, 2022