House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1680
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted CS/SB 1680
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
PCS added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/28/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|