Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0431 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 17, 2022
Bill January 21, 2022